THE BARBADOS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (READING AREA)

Charity number: 1102221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR JEFF JONES Chair 07 June 2013 None on record
CARLISLE BOVELL Trustee 07 June 2013 None on record
ANESTA VAUGHAN Trustee 07 June 2013 None on record
Margaret Vaughan Trustee 17 June 2016 None on record
NORMA PARRIS Trustee 07 June 2013 None on record
ASTAIRE ESTWICK Trustee 16 June 2017 None on record
Richard Weekes Trustee 12 June 2015 None on record
TREVOR SMALL Trustee 07 June 2013 None on record
Stella Holder Trustee 17 June 2018 None on record
NIGEL CHANDLER Trustee 16 June 2017 None on record
DAVID VAUGHAN Trustee 07 June 2013 None on record