Trustees INTERNATIONAL CARE NETWORK

Charity number: 1099400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Orman Chair 02 May 2019
None on record
katharine Anne Palka Trustee 10 August 2022
None on record
Dr Johannes Radvan Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Mireille Mason Trustee 23 July 2020
None on record
Andrew Paul Muir Trustee 02 May 2019
None on record
Barnabus Kavai Trustee 14 April 2016
None on record
Chika Udezue Trustee 21 November 2013
None on record