KATHY EVANS AFGHAN EDUCATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are funding the start up of a jewellery school in Kabul in partnership with Turquoise Mountain. We also donate to Khorasan Orphanage in Kabut.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 04 July 2003: Standard registration
- 14 February 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- KATHY EVANS AFGHAN EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 30/06/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.09k | £18.31k | £12.07k | £2.84k | £168 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.24k | £22.92k | £100.66k | £80.71k | £163.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 25 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 09 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 09 September 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 02 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 11 September 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 3 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT EFFORTS IN THE FIELD OF SECONDARY EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN AFGHANISTAN
Area of benefit
AFGHANISTAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window