ISLAMIC HELP

Charity number: 1100259
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1430 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1430 days
Annual return 30 April 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1795 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1795 days
Annual return 31 March 2015 26 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 26 January 2016 On time
Annual return 31 March 2014 29 January 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 30 January 2015 On time
Annual return 31 March 2013 30 January 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 30 January 2014 On time