ISLAMIC HELP

Charity number: 1100259
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £3.10m £3.57m £4.11m £4.41m £6.76m
Total expenditure £2.69m £3.77m £4.20m £4.39m £7.65m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies £2.98m £2.90m £3.95m £4.23m £5.44m
Income - Other trading activities £119.04k £216.41k £165.53k £178.55k £235.93k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £447.66k £0 £0 £1.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.49k £2.22k £0 £619 £600
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.89m £2.58m £2.78m £2.88m £6.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £34.63k £56.51k £23.75k £55.00k £22.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0