Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARK'S ELM TREE

Charity number: 1098458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.87k £1.84k £853 £550 £1.29k
Total expenditure £397 £352 £110 £0 £45
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A