Trustees BRAINTREE HALSTEAD AND WITHAM CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity number: 1099232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Wotton | Chair | 05 June 2019 |
|
|||||
William Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
John Evans | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Ainsworth | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
STUART FREEL | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Harrison | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Talbot | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Nadia McLeod | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Gilfillan | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GORDON BALFOUR | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.