THE OXFORD SYMPOSIUM ON FOOD AND COOKERY

Charity number: 1100956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 22 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 10 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 10 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 13 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 13 July 2017 On time Download