Financial history MABLETHORPE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1099116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £72.44k £91.09k £71.00k £995 £0
Total expenditure £60.45k £78.93k £81.18k £710 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A