Dogfen lywodraethu YOUTH EDUCATION SUPPORT SERVICES LONDON
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 3 SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 24 AUGUST 2003. CERTIFICATE ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28 AUGUST 2003. as amended on 08 Apr 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To advance the education and conditions of life of young people under the age of 30 in London and anywhere in the world by the provision of advice, guidance and education, educational facilities and other facilities in the interests of social welfare and the relief of poverty for those young people.
Maes buddion
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.