BALLET BLACK

Charity number: 1101599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 07 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 06 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 15 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 15 February 2017 On time Download