AFRICAN MANDE UNION LIMITED

Charity number: 1100654
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 December 2020 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 April 2020 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 March 2019 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 March 2019 141 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 July 2018 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 July 2018 265 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1791 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1791 days