DONCASTER SUB-AQUA CLUB (DSAC)

Charity number: 1103277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 November 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 August 2018 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 23 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required