DONCASTER SUB-AQUA CLUB (DSAC)

Charity number: 1103277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £14.62k £12.37k £20.65k £8.54k £19.14k
Total expenditure £12.69k £12.01k £10.47k £12.06k £6.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k