RFLF - THE ROBERT FOOT LEUKAEMIA FUND

Charity number: 1102130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £6.74k £5.79k £9.73k £15.20k £7.66k
Total expenditure £4.00k £0 £11.00k £22.00k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A