HASTINGS AND ROTHER MEDIATION SERVICE

Charity number: 1100825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £156.42k £144.07k £149.84k £153.74k £160.64k
Total expenditure £147.00k £143.02k £146.72k £149.22k £154.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £8.40k £32.31k £35.13k N/A
Income from government grants £8.40k £0 £0 £8.40k £8.40k