ST JAMES' SCHOOL GRIMSBY LTD

Charity number: 1099060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 10 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 23 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 August 2017 32 days late Download