ST JAMES' SCHOOL GRIMSBY LTD

Charity number: 1099060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.10m £2.05m £2.33m £2.32m £2.19m
Total expenditure £2.06m £2.04m £2.31m £2.31m £2.35m
Income from government contracts £250.33k £247.05k N/A £143.59k £92.24k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £46.83k N/A £92.05k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.19k £9.32k £110.83k £4.67k £270.31k
Income - Other trading activities £14.33k £19.21k £42.35k £37.99k £13.96k
Income - Charitable activities £2.08m £2.02m £2.17m £2.28m £1.63m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £398 £383 £392 £407 £418
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £278.90k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.96m £2.03m £2.25m £2.24m £2.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £15.23k £60.52k £66.40k £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.56k £307.61k £6.22k £22.76k £30.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £95.62k £0 £0 £0 £0