MIDWAY F.C.

Charity number: 1104015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of football within the local community for people of all levels of ability, age, background or ethnicity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 18 June 2024

Total income: £19,293
Total expenditure: £19,620

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire
  • Leicestershire
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 May 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • M.F.C (Working name)
  • MIDWAY F.C. JUNIORS (Working name)
  • MIDWAY F.C. LADIES (Working name)
  • MIDWAY FOOTBALL CLUB (Working name)
  • MIDWAY JUNIORS F.C. (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daren Trotter Trustee 30 September 2024
None on record
James Baillie Trustee 04 April 2024
None on record
Kara McFarlane Trustee 04 April 2024
None on record
IAN DAVIES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 11/06/2023 18/06/2024
Total gross income £4.60k £10.90k £8.02k £11.47k £19.29k
Total expenditure £2.20k £8.84k £5.34k £8.44k £19.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 June 2024 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 11 June 2023 19 June 2024 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 January 2023 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 January 2023 627 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Saltersford Farm Cottages
Measham Road
Acresford
SWADLINCOTE
Derbyshire
DE12 8AH
Phone:
07799537072