BRIDGING THE GAP TRUST

Charity number: 1099340
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Helping prisoners and ex-prisoners adjust to life outside. A comprehensive range of advice for releasees guides them to accommodation, training, employment and a crime-free life within their communities. Pre-release programmes include a penpal scheme, periodic writing competitions and life skills training. Advocacy, mediation, mentoring and help with form-filling etc also offered upon release.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018

Total income: £4,441
Total expenditure: £193

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 September 2003: Standard registration
  • 08 April 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BRIDGING THE GAP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £4.31k £374 £315 £303 £4.44k
Total expenditure £438 £2.35k £75 £0 £193
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 July 2019 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required