Trustees MONEY ADVICE TRUST

Charity number: 1099506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Farnish Chair 17 July 2023
None on record
Mark Allison Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Zitah McMillan Trustee 16 August 2023
None on record
Alexandra Meagher Trustee 16 August 2023
None on record
Adam Khan Trustee 16 August 2023
None on record
Sarah Ruth Desai Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Lucy Elizabeth Malenczuk Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Laurence Edward Burgess Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Rebecca Clare Wilkie Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Paul Howard Smee Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record