Trustees THE QUAY THEATRE AT SUDBURY

Charity number: 1099868
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Ronald Willson Trustee 05 January 2023
HIVE
Received: On time
Thomas David Lagden Trustee 09 February 2022
None on record
Peter Michael Keogh Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Judith Blatch Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Deirdre Katherine Duffy Trustee 26 April 2020
None on record
PAUL WILLIAM PRESS Trustee 09 April 2012
None on record
ELIZABETH JOAN COLE Trustee
None on record