MARSDEN CRICKET CLUB

Charity number: 1100078
Charity reporting is up to date (113 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 February 2021 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 February 2021 113 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 November 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 November 2018 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 28 October 2016 On time Download