Accounts and annual returns HINDU SAMAJ SWINDON

Charity number: 1108534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 20 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required