Financial history HINDU SAMAJ SWINDON

Charity number: 1108534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £10.37k £11.79k £13.58k £11.01k £15.80k
Total expenditure £9.23k £11.63k £17.84k £9.23k £17.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A