Accounts and annual returns LLANELLY HOUSE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1106646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window