Financial history LLANELLY HOUSE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1106646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £246.46k £153.95k £173.70k £204.63k £195.06k
Total expenditure £289.49k £238.27k £188.08k £120.34k £222.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £129.00k £116.50k £124.00k £134.00k £152.56k