Financial history REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (RCCG) LIBERTY CHRISTIAN CONNECTIONS

Charity number: 1099911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £371.25k £413.46k £398.98k £459.26k £499.16k
Total expenditure £368.80k £355.29k £362.32k £295.30k £276.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £54.21k