MATCHBOX DAY NURSERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1103781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £975.09k £997.11k £998.41k £983.41k £995.31k
Total expenditure £980.95k £995.98k £996.24k £989.62k £993.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £974.79k £996.85k £997.80k £982.61k £995.09k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £300 £265 £611 £802 £215
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £980.95k £995.98k £996.24k £989.62k £993.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0