PRISM THE GIFT FUND

Charity number: 1099682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £27.13m £22.13m £42.39m £44.75m £93.64m
Total expenditure £10.75m £17.41m £30.78m £32.72m £52.56m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £26.49m £21.03m £40.94m £43.60m £91.18m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £297.43k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £338.58k £842.46k £968.80k £417.50k £422.95k
Income - Other £0 £257.49k £490.11k £728.76k £2.04m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.47m £17.00m £30.78m £32.01m £51.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.50k £20.00k £20.00k £15.00k £15.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.38m £16.98m £30.04m £32.00m £51.45m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £273.86k £407.13k £0 £713.76k £1.10m