PRISM THE GIFT FUND

Charity number: 1099682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ajaz Ahmed MBE Trustee 12 November 2018 None on record
Michael Ridley Trustee 31 October 2016 None on record
Penny Lovell Trustee 31 October 2016 None on record
Jonathan Gold Trustee 17 May 2021 None on record
Charles Mesquita Trustee 29 January 2014 None on record
Lord Dolar Popat Trustee 03 July 2019 None on record
Joanne Winston Trustee 31 October 2016 None on record
Tracey Reddings Trustee 20 June 2012 None on record
JAMES LIBSON Trustee 20 April 2017
THE SIR MARTIN GILBERT LEARNING CENTRE Received: On time