Trustees THE TRUST FOR DEVELOPING COMMUNITIES
Charity number: 1106623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Pattinson | Chair | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rowan Hillier | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McConnell | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Tania Skae | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Michael Kennedy | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Denis Byrne | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Heath | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BROWN MBE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.