GALPHAY VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
management and operation of Galphay Village Institute
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 02 January 2004: Standard registration
- GALPHAY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- GVI (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Talitha Sanders | Chair | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Charles Clegg | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debs Donaldson | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Sanders | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Lafford | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Duke | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Douglas James Metcalfe | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Petra Antonia Maria Oldeman | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mal Smart | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.61k | £186 | £301 | £523 | £2.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.87k | £2.17k | £4.19k | £5.47k | £2.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 JUNE 2003 AND CONVEYANCE DATED 9 MARCH 1944.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION, FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GALPHAY AND NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GALPHAY AND NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Galphay Village Hall
Galphay
RIPON
North Yorkshire
HG4 3NJ
- Phone:
- 01765650365
- Email:
- GVI@GALPHAY.ORG
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window