CHURCH LINKS

Charity number: 1104880
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 24 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 2ND FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WALSALL BY ASSISTING CHURCHES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN ADVANCING EDUCATION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS SO AS TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID RESIDENTS.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 13 July 2004 : registered
  • 06 January 2015 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body