MARLOWE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1099822
Removed charity
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 30 SEPTEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12TH MARCH 2004 AND 17 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON, MANAGING AND DEVELOPING A SCHOOL OFFERING A BROAD CURRICULUM WITH EMPHASES ON PARTICULAR SPECIALISMS ('THE ACADEMY')
Organisation type
Charitable company
Registration history
  • 02 October 2003 : registered
  • 25 August 2011 : removed (EXEMPT CHARITY)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services