THE PARSON CROSS COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FORUM

Charity number: 1102741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Damms Cllr Trustee 19 September 2017 None on record
LEIGH BRAMALL Trustee 02 September 2011 None on record
IAN DAVID BROWN Trustee None on record
Rebecca Akers Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Michael Leslie Chaplin Cllr Trustee 27 June 2019 None on record
Cyril Charles Olsen Trustee 25 September 2017 None on record
SHARON JILL BERRY Trustee 10 September 2013 None on record
NORMA ASHMORE Trustee 02 September 2011 None on record