Accounts and annual returns ST MICHAELS PTA (HOUGHTON-LE-SPRING)

Charity number: 1099883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 November 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required