Financial history Epilepsy Research Institute UK

Charity number: 1100394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.23m £2.65m £2.26m £1.23m £2.39m
Total expenditure £1.66m £1.64m £2.07m £2.00m £2.27m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £485.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.14m £2.57m £2.09m £1.11m £2.74m
Income - Other trading activities £29.96k £26.03k £28.60k £16.50k £25.59k
Income - Charitable activities £30.07k £18.07k £87.70k £0 £133.59k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.21k £36.35k £48.75k £64.74k £86.12k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £32.64k £0
Income - Legacies £1.36m £1.78m £1.31m £423.74k £1.52m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.42m £1.48m £1.87m £1.84m £2.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £240.91k £162.49k £198.46k £158.94k £174.65k
Expenditure - Governance £15.03k £15.04k £23.83k £0 £27.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.03m £1.02m £1.34m £1.32m £1.57m
Expenditure - Investment management £3.26k £20.13k £10.12k £18.92k £18.37k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0