HOUSE ON THE ROCK

Charity number: 1102396
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 November 2021 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 November 2021 367 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time Download