HOUSE ON THE ROCK

Charity number: 1102396
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £751.12k £686.22k £664.53k £666.05k £472.58k
Total expenditure £863.49k £707.91k £710.33k £679.95k £568.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £634.94k £560.09k £528.35k £535.60k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £1.76k -£701 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £114.42k £126.84k £136.17k £130.46k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £851.50k £704.41k £702.86k £671.50k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.00k £3.51k £7.48k £8.45k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £63.37k £54.70k £58.63k £56.52k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A