Financial history TRANSFORM DRUG POLICY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1100518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £319.22k £378.87k £458.71k £363.22k £232.95k
Total expenditure £398.75k £394.66k £373.15k £414.39k £384.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A