Accounts and annual returns THE BARNABAS SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1101022
Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 8 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 8 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required