Financial history THE BARNABAS SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1101022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.75k £8.59k £8.88k £8.98k £1.26k
Total expenditure £8.30k £9.90k £10.34k £8.59k £264
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A