GOOD GOVERNANCE AFRICA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Throughout England and Wales
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People
3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 June 2004: Standard registration
- GGA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marc Pascal Raymond Toussaint | Trustee | 20 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deji Olaolu Haastrup | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HUGH ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.37k | £41.76k | £426.32k | £261.54k | £246.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.64k | £37.59k | £420.52k | £271.03k | £244.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 23 May 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 23 May 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 27 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE GOVERNANCE AND OPERATION OF COUNTRIES AND SOCIETIES IN AFRICA AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 2. THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC GOOD OF EFFICIENT PUBLIC ADMINISTRATION OF GOVERNMENT, PUBLIC SERVICE AND GOOD GOVERNANCE IN AFRICA BY MEANS OF THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE WITH PROGRAMMES OF STUDY, RESEARCH, EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND THE PROVISION OF RESEARCH MATERIALS FO SUCH PROGRAMMES.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O DEREK FIELD & CO
37 HIGH STREET
EAST GRINSTEAD
WEST SUSSEX
RH19 3AF
- Phone:
- 01342327353
- Email:
- info@ggacharity.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window