BUSHEY MANOR FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of open space in Bushey for general public Care for the environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 15 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Sarah Kate Gray | Chair | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Lynne Fielding | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Helene Roberts | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Llewellyn Davies | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
William James Penketh | Trustee | 20 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
LAURENCE STEPHEN BRASS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
CAREY KEATES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
COUNCILLOR S QUILTY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.09k | £14.94k | £14.35k | £11.84k | £11.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.71k | £8.74k | £34.32k | £22.20k | £7.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 July 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 October 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF THE PROPERTY AND SHALL ACCORDINGLY HOLD ANY PROPERTY TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN ENCLOSED OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS "BUSHEY MANOR FIELD" FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Beechcroft Road
BUSHEY
WD23 2JU
- Phone:
- 01923 233047
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window