CONNECTING VIBES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
connectingvibes is a dance performance company for young artists at the beginning of their career. The company provides professional work experience and tours to National Arts venues, Schools and Colleges. Performances are often accompanied by workshops. The company provides ongoing dance classes for young artists and young people. Dancers, designers and musicians become part of the company.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Harrison | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Waddah Sinada | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Dennis | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tianna Williams- Powell | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Partin | Trustee | 18 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.94k | £2.55k | £3.55k | £3.49k | £3.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.05k | £1.68k | £4.85k | £2.97k | £3.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR DANCE AND THE PERFORMING ARTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Basement Flat
48 Jerningham Road
LONDON
SE14 5NW
- Phone:
- 0208 691 6099
- Email:
- connectingvibes@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window