AL-HIDAYAH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates a Mosque and Maddressah. 5 daily prayers takes place daily and the Maddressah classes (supplementary school) operates from 5pm to 7.30pm Monday to Friday for children above the age of 5.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kirklees
Governance
- 13 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ibrahim Hasan | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Abudlrahim Dalal | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ABDULRAHIM DALAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.38k | £89.42k | £58.90k | £59.54k | £58.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.05k | £50.20k | £46.65k | £66.56k | £64.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 322 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 322 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 April 2022 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 April 2022 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED 1 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH ITS DOCTRINES AND BELIEFS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A MOSQUE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MUSLIMS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY OPERATING A MADRESSAH FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN OF MUSLIMS; AND 3) TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF MUSLIMS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE DEWSBURY, WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Masjid Al Hidayah 64 Caledonian Rd
DEWSBURY
West Yorkshire
WF12 9NU
- Phone:
- 01924457079
- Email:
- admin@masjidalhidayah.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window