Accounts and annual returns GREENLANE DISABLED ARCHERS

Charity number: 1101350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 05 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 May 2021 298 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 24 May 2021 664 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required