Financial history THE ALKAPTONURIA SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 1101052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £227.02k £266.55k £312.80k £335.22k £586.71k
Total expenditure £213.60k £251.71k £246.95k £272.75k £300.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £304.88k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £281.50k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £330
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £299.75k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £600
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £37.50k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0