THE CHURCH IN BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church advances the Christian faith through - the preaching of the Gospel, by the spiritual nourishment of new believers, by holding meetings for prayer and remembrance of the Lord, by seeking to raise up and support full time workers, by supporting works to spread the Gospel both locally and abroad and by regular and frequent fellowship with other churches throughout the earth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 14 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Noel Reginald Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Woolnough | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justin Heck | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Saulius Narbutas | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sung-Hyuk Hong | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hieng Siew Kong | Trustee | 27 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hieng Sing Kong | Trustee | 27 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER LI FUNG LIN | Trustee | 27 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID CHUNG YONG WONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.02k | £36.69k | £55.78k | £57.57k | £58.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.82k | £15.97k | £16.32k | £20.23k | £48.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2020
(These accounts |
24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON 4TH OCTOBER 2003.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND WITHOUT DISTINCTION BETWEEN CAPITAL AND INCOME TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH SET OUT IN THE SECOND SCHEDULE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Church In Birmingham
137 Lyttelton Road
Stechford
BIRMINGHAM
B33 8BN
- Phone:
- 01212491812
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window